MS SB2827 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 9-1-43, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Limit On Compensation Of Chancery Clerks And Circuit Clerks; To Amend Section 23-15-225, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Compensation Of County Registrars Of Election; To Amend Section 25-3-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Salaries Of County Tax Assessors And Collectors; To Amend Section 25-3-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Salaries Of County Supervisors; To Amend Section 25-7-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase Certain Filing Fees Charged By Chancery Clerks For The Recording Of Documents; To Amend Section 25-7-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Fee Paid To The Circuit Clerk For Each Day's Attendance Upon The Circuit Court Term; To Amend Section 25-7-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Fees Charged By Sheriffs; To Amend Section 25-7-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Fees Charged By Marshals And Constables; To Amend Section 41-61-59, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Salaries Of The County Medical Examiners, Deputy Medical Examiners And Deputy Medical Examiner Investigators; To Amend Section 41-61-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Fees Paid By The County To A Medical Examiner Or His Deputy For Filing Certain Investigation Reports, And To Extend The Date Of Repeal Thereon; To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Any County To Pay A Monthly Office Allowance To The Attorney Employed By The Board; To Create A County Elected Officials Compensation And Fees Task Force To Study The Structure, Amounts And Sources Of The Compensation Received By, And The Fees Charged And Collected By, The Elected Officials Of The Counties, And To Make Recommendations To Address The Compensation Received By, And The Fees Charged And Collected By, Elected County Officials On A Long-term Basis; To Direct The Task Force To Make A Report Of Its Findings And Recommendations To The Legislature By December 1, 2019; To Provide For The Members Of The Task Force; To Provide For The Organization Of The Task Force; To Authorize The Payment Of Per Diem And Expenses For Attending Meetings Of The Task Force; To Provide That If The Total Amount Of All Fees Received By The Office Of The Chancery Clerk Or By The Office Of The Circuit Clerk In Any Year Are Insufficient To Pay The Expenses Of The Office For That Year, The Clerk Shall Notify The Board Of Supervisors; To Provide That If The Board Makes A Finding And Enters On Its Minutes The Finding That The Fees Received By The Office Of The Clerk Are Insufficient To Pay The Expenses Of The Office For That Year, Then The Board Of Supervisors May Appropriate Funds Of The County To The Office Of The Clerk As Necessary To Supplement The Payment Of The Expenses Of The Office Of The Clerk; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County Elected Officials Compensation and Fees Task Force; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 99 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 93 N: 14 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18 Approved by Governor
2019-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-29SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-29HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-28HouseRecommitted For Further Conf
2019-03-28SenateRecommitted For Further Conf
2019-03-27SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-27HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-22HouseConferees Named Read,Barton,Sullivan
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Clarke,Tollison,Polk
2019-03-20SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-07HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-06HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-06HouseAmended
2019-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-20HouseReferred To Appropriations
2019-02-07SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-06SenatePassed
2019-02-06SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/SB/SB2827.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2827IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2827CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2827PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2827SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2827_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0300006.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0580010.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0810003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0810003.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback