MS SB2825 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Transfer, On July 1, 2021, Law Enforcement Personnel And Law Enforcement Duties Of The Mississippi Transportation Commission And Mississippi Department Of Transportation Related To The Motor Carrier Regulatory Law Of 1938 To The Commercial Transportation Enforcement Division Within The Department Of Public Safety; To Create The Dps Motor Carrier Enforcement Fund As A Special Fund In The State Treasury To Defray Expenses For Officers' Salaries And Other Costs To Implement And Enforce This Act; To Amend Sections 77-7-7, 77-7-11, 77-7-13, 77-7-15, 77-7-16, 77-7-17, 77-7-21, 77-7-127, 77-7-311, 77-7-331, 77-7-333, 77-7-335, 77-7-337, 77-7-339, 77-7-341 And 45-3-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Amend Section 27-19-89, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Adjust The Penalties For Harvest Permit Holders For Weight Limit Violations; To Conform To An Increase In The Weight Tolerance For Harvest Permits, Beginning July 1, 2023, From 84,000 Pounds To 88,000 Pounds; To Amend Section 19-11-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt, From July 1, 2021, Through June 30, 2023, Projects Receiving Monies From The Emergency Road And Bridge Repair Fund From Limitations On Certain Expenditures For The Last Year Of The Term Of A County Board Of Supervisors; To Amend Section 63-5-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase, Beginning July 1, 2023, The Maximum Gross Vehicle Weight Tolerance, From 84,000 Pounds To 88,000 Pounds, Which Is From 5% To 10% Of The Authorized 80,000 Pounds, For A Vehicle Operating Under A Harvest Permit; To Amend Section 65-1-46, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Transfer The Appeals Board Of The Mississippi Transportation Commission To The Commercial Transportation Enforcement Division Of The Department Of Public Safety; To Establish The Harvest Permit Transportation Stewardship Council To Advise The Legislature On Policy And To Make Best Practices Recommendations To Harvest Permit Holders And Receiving Facilities For The Purpose Of Deterring Overweight Hauling And Protecting The State's Infrastructure System; To Provide That The Council Shall Be Dissolved On July 1, 2023; To Transfer $89,000,000.00 Of Highway Infrastructure Program Funds Received By The State Pursuant To The Coronavirus Response And Relief Supplemental Appropriations Act Of 2021 To The Emergency Road And Bridge Repair Fund; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation; revise provisions relating to motor carrier enforcement, harvest permits, and funding.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 87 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 95 N: 19 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22 Approved by Governor
2021-04-01HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-04-01SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2021-03-31SenateConference Report Adopted
2021-03-31HouseImmediate Release
2021-03-31HouseConference Report Adopted
2021-03-30HouseConference Report Filed
2021-03-30SenateConference Report Filed
2021-03-30SenateRecommitted For Further Conf
2021-03-30HouseRecommitted For Further Conf
2021-03-30HousePoint of Order Raised
2021-03-29HouseConference Report Filed
2021-03-29SenateConference Report Filed
2021-03-24HouseConferees Named Busby,Massengill,Crudup
2021-03-16SenateConferees Named Branning,Thompson,Hopson
2021-03-16SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2021-03-10HouseReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-09HousePassed As Amended
2021-03-09HouseAmended
2021-03-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-26HouseReferred To Transportation
2021-02-22SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-11SenatePassed As Amended
2021-02-11SenateAmended
2021-02-11SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-02-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-18SenateReferred To Highways and Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
191127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
271989Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
63533Amended CodeSee Bill Text
65146Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
777127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77713New CodeSee Bill Text
77715New CodeSee Bill Text
77716Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77717Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77721Amended CodeSee Bill Text
777311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
777331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
777333Amended CodeSee Bill Text
777335Amended CodeSee Bill Text
777337Amended CodeSee Bill Text
777339Amended CodeSee Bill Text
777341Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7777Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/history/SB/SB2825.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2825IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2825CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2825PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2800-2899/SB2825SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/sam/SB2825_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/sam/SB2825_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/sam/SB2825_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_03.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/ham/SB2825_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0380033.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0640057.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/house/0860003.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0860009.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback