MS SB2822 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Failed on March 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The "mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive Act"; To Define Terms; To Establish Requirements And Standards For Application To The Mississippi Development Authority For Certification And Award Of The Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive; To Establish Requirements And Standards For The Certification And Award Of The Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive By The Mississippi Development Authority To A Qualified Business Or Industry For A Qualified Economic Development Project; To Prescribe The Means Of Calculating And Applying Such Incentive; To Prohibit Utilization Of Certain Other Incentives In Combination With The Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive; To Establish Requirements And Standards For Annual Reporting By A Qualified Business Or Industry, Modifications To Prior Incentive Awards By The Mississippi Development Authority And Deadlines For The Utilization Of Such Incentive; To Authorize Audits By The Mississippi Department Of Revenue And Sharing Of Certain Information About Certain Incentive Awardees Between State Agencies; To Clarify That The Mississippi Development Authority Is Granted Exclusive Jurisdiction To Certify, Award And Make Any Adjustments To A Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive For A Qualified Business Or Industry; To Authorize The Mississippi Development Authority And The Mississippi Department Of Revenue To Promulgate Rules And Regulations Necessary To Implement This Act; To Amend Section 27-7-22, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Application Of A Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive As A Credit To Offset State Income Tax Liability; To Amend Section 27-7-309, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Application Of A Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive As A Credit To Offset Withholding Tax Liability; To Amend Section 27-7-311, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exclude Any Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive Applied As A Credit To Offset State Income Tax Liability From The Annual Statement Required To Be Filed With The Commissioner Of Revenue For An Employee; To Amend Section 27-13-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Application Of A Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive As A Credit To Offset Franchise Tax Liability Of Mississippi Corporations; To Amend Section 27-13-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Application Of A Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive As A Credit To Offset Franchise Tax Liability Of Foreign Corporations; To Amend Section 27-65-93, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Revenue To Issue A Direct Pay Permit To A Qualified Business Or Industry That Is Awarded A Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive By The Mississippi Development Authority; To Amend Section 27-67-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Application Of A Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive As A Credit To Offset State Use Tax Liability; To Amend Section 57-1-14, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delay Or Preclude Certain Information Provided In Applications And Annual Reports For The Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive From Disclosure Pursuant To The Mississippi Public Records Act Of 1983; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Flexible Tax Incentive Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27SenateDied In Conference
2021-03-23HouseConferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Massengill
2021-03-22SenateConferees Named Harkins,Parker,Fillingane
2021-03-18SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2021-03-17HouseReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-16HousePassed As Amended
2021-03-16HouseAmended
2021-03-15HouseRead the Third Time
2021-03-11HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-24HouseReferred To Ways and Means
2021-02-22SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-18SenatePassed
2021-02-17SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-02-17SenateDR - TSDP: FI To EC
2021-01-18SenateReferred To Finance;Economic and Workforce Development

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
27135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
276593Amended CodeSee Bill Text
276717Amended CodeSee Bill Text
27722Amended CodeSee Bill Text
277309Amended CodeSee Bill Text
277311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
57114Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback