MS SB2811 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish A Procedure For The Disposition Of Abandoned Manufactured Or Mobile Homes And Associated Personal Property; To Provide Definitions; To Provide For A Complaint For Disposition Of Abandoned Manufactured Or Mobile Homes; To Provide For The Entry Of An Order By The Court Naming A Commissioner To Handle The Disposition And Setting The Date And Time Of The Sale; To Provide For Advertisement And Procedures For The Sale; To Provide For Payment Of Debt And Exercise Of Possession; To Provide For Disbursement Of Bid Amount By The Commissioner; To Provide For Entry Of A Final Order And Submission Of The Bill Of Sale To The Mississippi Department Of Revenue; To Provide That This Proceeding Is A Good Faith Defense Of The Owner Of Real Property To Claims Of Wrongful Sale; To Amend Section 19-3-85, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Abandoned manufactured or mobile homes; establish procedure for disposition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Finance |