MS SB2806 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Bring Forward Sections 27-3-31, 67-1-37, 67-1-41, 67-1-43 And 67-1-45, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; To Provide That The Legislature Shall Appropriate Funds For Necessary Upgrades To The Alcoholic Beverage Control Division Warehouse; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Revenue; bring forward code sections relating to ABC Division and authority to contract for services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2021-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Steverson,Horan |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,Johnson,Carter |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2021-03-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Amended |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
27 | 3 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 41 | New Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
67 | 1 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |