MS SB2803 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-11)
Status: Failed on March 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-3-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Annual Salaries Of The County Sheriffs; To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors To Pay An Annual Supplement To The Sheriff Of Any County In Which A Juvenile Detention Center Is Located; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sheriffs; increase annual salaries of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,Barton |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Polk,Butler (36th),Harkins |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |