MS SB2795 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act Entitled The "mississippi Earned Parole Eligibility Act"; To Amend Section 47-7-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prescribe Conditions For Parole Eligibility And To Provide Limitations On Inmate Eligibility To Petition The Sentencing Court For Parole Eligibility If The Inmate Is Serving A Sentence For A Crime Of Violence Or Nonviolence; To Amend Section 47-7-3.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Inmate Case Planning And To Prescribe Dates For The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To Complete Case Plans For Parole-eligible Inmates To Ensure That The Plan Is Achievable; To Amend Section 47-7-3.2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Minimum Time That Offenders Convicted Of A Crime Of Violence Must Serve Before Release And A Minimum Percentage Of Other Sentences That Other Offenders Must Serve Before Release; To Amend Section 47-7-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove Prohibition Against Compensation Or Per Diem Of The Mississippi Parole Board, Its Requirements, And The Minimum Vote Required To Grant Parole To An Inmate Convicted Of Capital Murder Or Sex Offense; To Amend Section 47-7-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Section 47-7-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Victim Or Designated Family Member Shall Be Provided An Opportunity To Be Heard By The Parole Board Prior To A Parole Decision; To Amend Section 47-7-18, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Certain Parole Hearings For Sex Offenders; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Mississippi Earned Parole Eligibility Act"; enact.
Sponsors
Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [R] | Sen. Albert Butler [D] |
Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Sarita Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 90 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 35 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 105 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-04-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-30 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-30 | House | Point of Order-Not Well Taken |
2021-03-30 | House | Point of Order Raised |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Horan,Goodin,Faulkner |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Conferees Named Barnett,Sparks,Wiggins |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-10 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2021-03-09 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Horan, Mickens, Hobgood-Wilkes) |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Corrections |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 7 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 7 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |