MS SB2785 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-77-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Commissioner Of Revenue To Reduce A Tax Liability Based On Additional Information Or Documentation Provided By A Taxpayer After The Board Of Tax Appeals Has Issued An Order; To Provide That The Commissioner Shall Have 30 Days To Issue A Determination, During Which The 60-day Period For Appeal To The Chancery Court Shall Be Tolled; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Taxation; allow Commissioner of Revenue to reduce tax based on additional information after order of Board of Tax Appeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Committee Substitute Failed |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Tabled Subject To Call |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |