MS SB2785 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Require The Department Of Finance And Administration To Convey The Mississippi Transportation Commission Certain Real Property Along North West Street Within The City Of Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Department of Finance and Administration; required to convey certain property to MS Transportation Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | Died In Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Referred To Public Property | |
2012-03-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-07 | Passed | |
2012-03-07 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2012-02-29 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Public Property |