MS SB2782 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-10)
Status: Failed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-10)
Status: Failed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-2-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of "cause Of Death" Under The Law Enforcement Officers And Fire Fighters' Death Benefits Trust Fund To Include The Presumption Of Eligibility For Death Benefits For Officers With Covid-19 Provided By The Safeguarding America's First Responders Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Law Enforcement Officers Death Benefits Trust Fund; include presumption of eligibility for officers with COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |