MS SB2779 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-12 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-104-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Mississippi Department Of Information Technology Services (mdits) To Charge State Agencies Pass-through Costs For Telecommunications, Data Center Services And/or Other Information Technology Services To The Agencies Using Those Services On An As-needed Basis; To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Charge State Agencies For Mississippi Management And Reporting Systems (mmrs) Statewide Application Charges And Utility Charges If Federal Grants, Special Funds Or Pass-through Funds Are Involved; To Amend Section 27-104-205, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Certain Restrictions On The Mississippi Department Of Information Technology Services Being Funded From The State General Fund; To Amend Sections 25-53-5, 25-53-29 And 25-53-151, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Department of Information Technology Services (MDITS); authorize to charge state agencies for certain services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-21 | House | Conferees Named Read,DeLano,Bounds |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Conferees Named Clarke,Moran,Hopson |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-02-27 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-02-23 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-23 | House | Amended |
2018-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |