MS SB2773 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-26 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-73-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, As Amended By Senate Bill No. 2095, 2022 Regular Session, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Provision Of Law That Authorizes An Income Tax Credit For Any Company That Transfers Or Relocates Its National Or Regional Headquarters To The State Of Mississippi From Outside The State Of Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Income tax; extend repealer on credit for certain costs paid by a company in relocating national or regional headquarters to this state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-26 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |