MS SB2772 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-51-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Certain Terms As Used In The Dental Care Benefits Law; To Create A New Section To Require Dental Service Contractors To Establish Appeal Procedures For Claim Denials Based Upon Lack Of Medical Necessity; To Prohibit Claim Denials For Procedures Specifically Included In A Prior Authorization Unless Certain Circumstances Apply; To Provide A Time Limit For Prior Authorization Approvals; To Prohibit The Recoupment Of A Claim In Certain Circumstances; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Dental insurance benefits; prohibit the denial or recoupment of a claim in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Insurance;Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-30 | Senate | DR - TSDP: IN To AP |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Insurance;Appropriations |