MS SB2765 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Enact The Mississippi Medical Cannabis Act; To Authorize Medical Cannabis Use By Certain Patients Who Have Debilitating Medical Conditions; To Provide Certain Protections To Patients, Caregivers, Medical Providers, Medical Cannabis Establishments, Dispensaries, Pharmacies And Testing Facilities For The Medical Use Of Cannabis; To Provide That The State Department Of Health Will Issue Registry Identification Cards To Qualifying Patients And Registrations To Qualifying Facilities; To Provide For The Licensing Of Cannabis Research Facilities, Testing Facilities And Cultivation-processing Facilities By The Department Of Agriculture And Commerce; To Exempt The Research Facility At The University Of Mississippi From The Application And Annual License Renewal Fees; To Authorize Local Governments To Enact Certain Ordinances Not In Conflict With This Act; To Prohibit Local Taxes On Cannabis Or Cannabis Establishments; To Require The Department Of Health, The Department Of Agriculture And Commerce, And The Department Of Revenue To Promulgate Rules And Regulations Specific To The Role Of Each Department In Accomplishing The Purposes Of This Act; To Require The Department Of Agriculture And Commerce And The Department Of Revenue To Maintain A Public Registry Of Medical Cannabis Establishments; To Provide Civil And Criminal Penalties For Violations Of This Act; To Require The Department Of Health And The Department Of Revenue To Make Annual Reports To The Legislature; To Provide That Banks May Provide The Services To Medical Cannabis Licensees That May Be Provided To Any Other Business; To Create New Section 27-65-28, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Retail Sales Of Medical Cannabis Products Shall Be Taxed At 7%; To Impose An Excise Tax Of 4% On Medical Cannabis Products; To Create The Workforce And College Opportunity Scholarship Fund In The State Treasury; To Provide That Revenue Generated From The Sales Tax And Excise Tax On Medical Cannabis Products, Aside From The 18.5% Sales Tax Diversion For Municipalities, Shall Be Deposited Into The Fund; To Provide That The First 25% Of The Revenue In The Fund Shall Be Allocated To The Department Of Education For The State Share For Early Learning Collaboratives As Established In Section 37-21-51, The Next 25% Shall Be Allocated To The Department Of Education For A Standardized Dual Enrollment Program, And The Remaining Funds Shall Be Allocated To The Postsecondary Education Financial Assistance Board As Established In Section 37-106-9 To Create A "last-dollar" Scholarship Program For Community College Students, University Students, Academic Or Career And Technical, With The Goal Of Providing Tuition, Room And Board, Books And Materials To Mississippi Students; To Amend Sections 27-65-75, 41-29-125, 41-29-127, 41-29-136, 41-29-137, 41-29-139, 41-29-141 And 41-29-143, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provisions; To Provide That The Act Shall Repeal Three Years From Its Effective Date; To Provide That The Act Shall Take Effect On The Date, If Any, That The Provisions Of Initiative 65 Of 2020 Are Enjoined Or Otherwise Ruled Of No Legal Force And Effect; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Medical Cannabis Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 30 N: 21 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-10HouseDied On Calendar
2021-03-10HouseTabled
2021-03-10HousePoint of Order Raised
2021-03-10HousePoint of Order-Not Well Taken
2021-03-10HousePoint of Order Raised
2021-03-08HouseRead the Third Time
2021-03-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-02-26HouseReferred To Ways and Means
2021-02-12SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-12SenatePassed As Amended
2021-02-12SenateReconsidered
2021-02-11SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2021-02-11SenateFailed
2021-02-11SenateAmended
2021-02-11SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2021-02-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2021-01-18SenateReferred To Finance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
276575Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4129125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4129127Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4129136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4129137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4129139Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4129141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4129143Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/history/SB/SB2765.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2765IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2765CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2765PS.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/sam/SB2765_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/sam/SB2765_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_02.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/ham/SB2765_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2021/html/ham/SB2765_H_Subst_1_for_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0380024.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2021/pdf/votes/senate/0390007.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback