MS SB2759 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 73-77-5, 73-77-7 And 73-77-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Certain Provisions Of The Fresh Start Act Of 2019 Shall Apply Notwithstanding Any Other Provision Of Law; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fresh Start Act of 2019; revise applicability of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 6 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-10SenateDied In Conference
2020-06-23HouseConferees Named Bell (21st),White,Haney
2020-06-22SenateConferees Named Horhn,Wiggins,Thompson
2020-06-18SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-17HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-16HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-16HouseAmended
2020-06-09HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-09HouseDR - TSDPAA: JB To WD
2020-06-04HouseDR - TSDPAA: WD To JB
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Workforce Development;Judiciary B
2020-03-16SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-12SenatePassed As Amended
2020-03-12SenateAmended
2020-03-12SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-03-03SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-03-03SenateDR - TSDPCS: JB To LA
2020-02-25SenateDR - TSDPCS: LA To JB
2020-02-17SenateReferred To Labor;Judiciary, Division B

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback