MS SB2758 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 31-5-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Contractors Submitting Bids For Public Works That Utilized Funds Received By State Or Local Governmental Entities Resulting From A Federally Declared Disaster Or A Spill Of National Significance, To Submit With Their Bid A Signed Agreement Acknowledging Awareness Of The Requirements Of This Section; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public works contracts; if contracts funded as result of declared disaster, acknowledgement of laws regarding must accompany bid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Died In Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |