MS SB2758 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 59-5-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reconstitute And Revise The Qualifications Of The Board Of The State Port Authority; To Transfer Certain Duties From The Mississippi Development Authority To The Board; To Amend Sections 59-5-1, 59-5-7, 59-5-9, 59-5-35 And 59-5-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Amend Section 59-11-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Number Of Commissioners That Are Appointed To A Certain County Port And Harbor Commission; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State ports; revise membership of board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred To Ports, Harbors and Airports |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Amended |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources |