MS SB2757 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The South Mississippi Regional Health Care Authority; To Declare The Legislative Purpose Of The Authority; To Prescribe The Powers And Duties Of The Authority; To Grant The Authority Certain Powers; To Exempt The Authority From Certain Statutes Applicable To Community Hospitals And Other Governing Authorities; To Provide For State Action Immunity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
South Mississippi Regional Health Care Authority; establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Amended |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-02-02 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: PH To AC |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |