MS SB2752 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-29-61, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prescribe Certain Criminal Penalties For Conviction Of The Crime Of Voyeurism; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Voyeurism; prescribe criminal penalties for conviction.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | House | Died In Committee |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |