MS SB2752 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 21-23-8, 99-5-9 And 99-5-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Certain Revisions To The Bail System, To Provide That The Amount Of Bail Shall Be Presumed To Be Attainable By The Defendant, To Require The Court To Make A Determination Of Whether The Defendant Can Be Released On Recognizance In Cases Of Indigency, To Provide That No Misdemeanor Defendant Shall Be Incarcerated Or Released Solely Because He Cannot Afford To Post Bail, To Provide That The Court May Not Require Cash Bail From The Defendant; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Bail to be posted by criminal defendants; make revisions to bail system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-08 | House | Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Read the Third Time |
2017-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |