MS SB2752 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-15-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The State And School Employees' Health Insurance Management Board To Impose A Premium Surcharge On Retired Employees Who Are Under The Age For Medicare Eligibility And Who Were Initially Employed Before July 1, 2006, And Increase The Rate Of The Premium Surcharge Annually Not To Exceed Fifteen Percent Until The Premium Surcharge Amount Is Equal To The Amount That The Board Determines Actuarially To Cover The Full Cost Of The Insurance; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Health Insurance Management Board; authorize to impose premium surcharge on certain retirees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate Motion to Reconsider Tabled (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 37 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Insurance;Appropriations | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-11 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-02-09 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-02-09 | Passed | |
2010-02-09 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-01-28 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Insurance |