MS SB2751 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 73-67-15, 73-67-17, 73-67-19, 73-67-21 And 73-67-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The State Board Of Massage Therapy Shall Establish Requirements For The Registration Of Massage Services Establishments; To Require The Board To Share Documents With State And Federal Agencies; To Provide The Hours Of Training Requirements For Massage Therapy Practice; To Amend Section 73-67-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On Sections 73-67-1 Through 73-67-37; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Professional Massage Therapy Act; provide new requirements and extend the repealer thereon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 107 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2021-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-08 | House | Amended |
2021-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
73 | 67 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 67 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 67 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 67 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 67 | 35 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
73 | 67 | 39 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |