MS SB2744 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 77-3-803, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Definitions Of Certain Terms As Used In The Caller Id Anti-spoofing Act; To Amend Section 77-3-805, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Prohibition Against Caller Identification Spoofing; To Amend Sections 77-3-707 And 77-3-809, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Violation Of The Caller Id Anti-spoofing Act Is A Violation Of The Mississippi Telephone Solicitation Act, Which Shall Be In Addition To Any Other Remedies And Penalties Available Under The Law; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Caller ID Anti-Spoofing Act; conform to federal law and revise penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18 Approved by Governor
2019-04-03HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-03SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-26HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-26SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-25HouseConferees Named Beckett,Bounds,Steverson
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Doty,Harkins,Polk
2019-03-20SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-14HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-03-13HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Beckett, Steverson)
2019-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-02-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-20HouseReferred To Public Utilities
2019-02-18SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-13SenatePassed As Amended
2019-02-13SenateAmended
2019-02-13SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Energy

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/SB/SB2744.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2744IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2744CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2744PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/SB/2700-2799/SB2744SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/SB2744_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/ham/SB2744_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0370004.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0650019.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0800020.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0800014.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback