MS SB2737 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-27 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Sections 73-67-1 Through 73-67-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is The Mississippi Professional Massage Therapy Act; To Amend Section 73-67-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Definitions Under The Massage Therapy Act; To Amend Section 73-67-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Massage Therapy Licenses To Be Prominently Displayed And To Require Applicants To Complete Criminal Background Check And Fingerprinting For Licensure; To Amend Section 73-67-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prescribe Certain Examination Requirements For Applicants; To Amend Section 73-67-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Reciprocity Provisions; To Amend Section 73-67-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Certain Exemptions From Advertising Restrictions For Licensees; To Amend Section 73-67-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Certain Standards For Massage Therapy Schools; To Amend Section 73-67-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Automatic Repealer On The Mississippi Professional Massage Therapy Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Professional Massage Therapy Act; extend repealer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2013-03-07 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-06 | House | Amended |
2013-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |