MS SB2730 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 17, Chapter 1, Laws Of 1865, As Amended By Section 3, Chapter 169, Laws Of 1884, As Amended By Chapter 92, Laws Of 1904, As Amended By Chapter 421, Laws Of 1950, As Amended By Chapter 304, Laws Of 1952, As Amended By Chapter 347, Laws Of 1991, As Amended By Chapter 359, Laws Of 1997, As Amended By Chapter 385, Laws Of 2011, To Authorize Entry By The Mississippi Levee Board Onto Lands For Surveying And Other Purposes; To Amend Section 1, Chapter 426, Laws Of 1950, To Authorize Entry By The Yazoo-mississippi Delta Levee Board Onto Lands For Surveying And Other Purposes; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Levee commissioners; authorize surveyors to enter on lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-03 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-29 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Reynolds,Bailey |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Clarke,Parker |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-07 | House | Amended |
2013-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |