MS SB2724 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The "mississippi Association Of Independent Colleges And Universities (maicu) Infrastructure Grant Program Act Of 2022" Administered By The Mississippi Department Of Finance And Administration Utilizing Funds Made Available Under The Federal Coronavirus State Fiscal Recovery Funds And The Federal American Rescue Plan Act (arpa); To Provide That Such Grants Shall Be Made Available; To Prescribe Eligible Projects Under The Grant Program; To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Promulgate Grant Application Regulations; To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Administer The Maicu Grant Program And Retain Administrative Costs; To Create In The State Treasury A Special Fund Designated As The "mississippi Association Of Independent Colleges And Universities (maicu) Infrastructure Grant Program Fund"; To Amend Section 27-104-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"MS Association of Independent Colleges and Universities (MAICU) Infrastructure Grant Program Act of 2022"; establish.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-24 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |