MS SB2716 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Ratify The Interstate Compact Between The States Of Arkansas, Mississippi And Tennessee Creating The Regionsmart Development District And The Regionsmart Development Agency Of The Greater Memphis Region; To Provide That The Governing Authority Of The Regionsmart Development Agency Shall Be Vested In A Board Of Commissioners Consisting Of 15 Members, All Of Whom Shall Be Residents Of The District; To Name The Authorities Appointing The Commissioners, And To Fix The Terms Of The Commissioners; To Provide The Powers And Duties Of The Board Of Commissioners; To Provide That The Compact Shall Become Effective Upon Passage Of Appropriate Legislation In Two Of The Three States In Substantially Similar Form; To Provide That The Compact May Only Be Amended By The Passage Of Appropriate Legislation Approved By The States Which Are Then Parties To The Compact Concurring In The Amendment; To Require The Regionsmart Development Agency, Not Later Than March 31 Of Each Year, To Submit An Annual Report To The State Legislatures And Governors, And To The Individuals And Entities Holding The Powers Of Appointment Of The Board Of Commissioners; To Provide That No Part Of The Income And Earnings Of The Regionsmart Development Agency Shall Inure To The Benefit Or Profit Of A Private Individual Or Entity; To Set Requirements Regarding The Distribution Of The Assets Of The Regionsmart Development Agency Upon Its Dissolution; And For Related Purposes.
Title
RegionSmart Development Interstate Compact between Arkansas, Mississippi and Tennessee; ratify.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Died On Calendar |
2022-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-09 | House | Referred To Workforce Development |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Economic and Workforce Development |