MS SB2715 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A New Section In Title 65, Chapter 3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Mississippi Department Of Transportation To Erect Signs On Interstate 55 And Mississippi Highway 568 Directing Motorists To The Lynyrd Skynyrd Monument In Pike County, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Highways; require Dept. of Transportation to erect signs directing motorists to Lynyrd Skynyrd Monument in Pike County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To TR |
2020-06-04 | House | DR - TSDPAA: TR To AP |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |