MS SB2711 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 75-60-5 And 73-7-16, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Certain Nationally Accredited Proprietary Schools Are Authorized To Follow Federal Standards For Hiring And Training Faculty; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Nationally accredited proprietary schools; may follow federal standards for faculty.
Sponsors
Sen. Doug Davis [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-25 | Concurred in Amend From House | |
2010-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-24 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Universities and Colleges | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-10 | Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Universities and Colleges |