MS SB2709 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Referred To Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 83-75-1, 83-75-3 And 83-75-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Commercial Property In The Insurance Premium Discount Or Rate Reduction For Hurricane Or Windstorm Damage Mitigation; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance premium discount for hurricane or windstorm damage mitigation; include commercial property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Insurance
2020-03-06SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-05SenatePassed
2020-02-26SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-17SenateReferred To Insurance

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback