MS SB2704 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 99-43-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Enact Child Witness Standards Of Protection In Order To Grant Appropriate Accommodations To Children Testifying In Court To Lessen The Effect Of Mental And Emotional Suffering Upon The Child And To Ensure An Environment In The Legal Or Criminal Proceeding That Is Conducive To The Search For The Truth; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Legal proceedings; child witness to receive accommodations.
Sponsors
Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. William Longwitz [R] | Sen. Josh Harkins [R] | Sen. Philip Moran [R] |
Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Gray Tollison [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Died In Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |