MS SB2692 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - Referred To Transportation;Appropriations
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Designate A Portion Of Highway 11 In Jones County, Mississippi, As The "tyrone Stewart Memorial Highway"; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Memorial highway; designate portion of Highway 11 in Jones County for Police Chief Tyrone Stewart.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Transportation;Appropriations
2020-03-05SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-04SenatePassed
2020-02-26SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-17SenateReferred To Highways and Transportation

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback