MS SB2689 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-25 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 7-7-213, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Fee Which May Be Charged By The State Auditor For Performing Audits And Other Services; To Amend Section 7-7-211, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Auditor; increase fee which may be charged for performing audits and other services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 99 N: 19 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25SenateDied On Calendar
2021-03-10HouseReturned For Concurrence
2021-03-09HousePassed As Amended
2021-03-09HouseAmended
2021-03-02HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2021-03-02HouseDR - TSDPAA: AP To AC
2021-03-01HouseDR - TSDPAA: AC To AP
2021-02-26HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Appropriations
2021-02-10SenateTransmitted To House
2021-02-09SenatePassed
2021-01-28SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2021-01-18SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
77211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77213Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback