MS SB2681 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize Jackson State University, With The Approval Of The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning, To Transfer, Convey And Dispose Of Certain Tax-forfeited Real Property And Any Improvements Thereon That Are In The Possession And Control Of The University In The City Of Jackson, Mississippi, When The Property Has Ceased To Be Used For Educational Purposes; To Provide For A Right Of First Refusal For The Purchase Of The Property By Adjacent Homeowners And Other Homeowners Residing On The Same Street Or Block Or In The Same Neighborhood; To Provide That The Properties That Are Not Purchased By Adjacent Homeowners Or Other Homeowners In The Neighborhood Shall Be Transferred And Conveyed To A Nonprofit Community Development Corporation (cdc) That Serves As An Entity For The Revitalization Of The Community Surrounding The University; To Provide That The Cdc To Which The Properties Have Been Transferred May Sell Any Portion Or All Of The Properties, After First Advertising Notice Of Its Intent To Sell The Properties; To Provide That The Cdc Shall Transfer Fifty Percent Of The Net Proceeds Received From The Sale Of The Properties To The Department Of Finance And Administration For Deposit Into A Special Fund That Is Created In The State Treasury To Be Known As The "jackson State University Surplus Properties Fund"; To Provide That Monies In The Fund Shall Be Expended Only For Purposes Approved By The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning That Are For The Benefit Of Jackson State University; To Provide That Any Of The Properties That Are Not Sold By December 31, 2019, Shall Revert To The Possession And Control Of The University On January 1, 2020; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Jackson State University; authorize to sell certain tax-forfeited parcels.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2019-03-07 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-06 | House | Amended |
2019-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Amended |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |