MS SB2681 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 61-13-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Prohibition On The Department Of Finance And Administration To Purchase Liability Insurance Coverage For State Aircraft; To Authorize The Department Of Public Safety To Sell Its Aircraft And Retain The Proceeds From The Sale To Purchase Replacement Aircraft More Suited To The Needs Of The Department; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State aircraft; remove prohibition on the purchase of liability insurance coverage for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-29 | House | Conferees Named Chism,Buck (5th),Guice |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Carmichael,Clarke,Simmons (12th) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-04 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-28 | House | Amended |
2013-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Amended |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |