MS SB2675 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-07 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-1-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Amount Of Reward Which May Be Offered By The Commissioner Of Insurance In Cases Of Willful Destruction By Fire Or Explosion Of Any Real Or Personal Property Located In This State; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Commissioner of Insurance; increase the amount of reward which may be offered in cases of arson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-28 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-01 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | Passed |
2013-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |