MS SB2670 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-4-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealers On The Mississippi Department Of Mental Health Best Practices Committee And On The Provision That Authorizes The State Board Of Mental Health To Supervise, Coordinate And Establish Standards For All Operations And Activities Of The State Related To Mental Health And Providing Mental Health Services; To Codify Section 41-4-10, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prescribe The Membership And Responsibilities Of The Mental Health Strategic Planning And Best Practices Committee; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mental Health Reform Act of 2011; reenact and extend repealers.
Sponsors
Sen. Hob Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2013-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2013-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Mims,Barker,Currie |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Kirby,Burton,Bryan |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2013-03-04 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-01 | House | Amended |
2013-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |