MS SB2664 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-13-117, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Division Of Medicaid To Reimburse For Services Provided To Eligible Medicaid Beneficiaries By A Licensed Birthing Center In A Method And Manner To Be Determined By The Division In Accordance With Federal Laws And Federal Regulations; To Require The Division To Seek Any Necessary Waivers, Make Any Required Amendments To Its State Plan Or Revise Any Contracts Authorized Under The Section As Necessary To Provide The Services Authorized Under The Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Medicaid services; require Medicaid to reimburse licensed birthing centers and to seek necessary waivers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Medicaid |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Medicaid |