MS SB2663 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 39-5-22, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Eligibility Requirements To Receive A Grant From The Mississippi Historic Site Preservation Fund; To Require The Department Of Archives And History To Submit An Annual Report To Members Of The Legislature; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Historic Site Preservation Fund; revise grant eligibility and require annual report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-14 Approved by Governor
2023-03-08HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-08SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2023-03-03HouseReturned For Enrolling
2023-03-02HousePassed
2023-02-28HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-02-07HouseReferred To Appropriations
2023-02-02SenateTransmitted To House
2023-02-01SenatePassed
2023-01-26SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-01-16SenateReferred To Appropriations

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
39522Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback