MS SB2662 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-17 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-153, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Per Diem Compensation Of County And Municipal Election Commissioners For Conducting Primary, General, Special Or Runoff Elections; And For Related Purposes.
Title
County and municipal election commissioners; increase per diem compensation for conducting elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-17 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-09 | House | DR - TSDP: CA To AE |
2020-06-04 | House | DR - TSDP: AE To CA |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections;County Affairs |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-27 | Senate | DR - TSDP: EL To CA |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Elections;County Affairs |