MS SB2661 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 9-5-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delay The Election Of A Third Judge For The Seventh Chancery District; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Seventh Chancery District; delay election of third Chancellor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-09 | Referred To Judiciary A | |
2010-02-04 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-14 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |