MS SB2638 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 75-29-951, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Further Define Cottage Foods And Related Terms; To Provide A List Of Foods That Are Authorized As Cottage Foods Within The State; To Increase The Maximum Annual Gross Sales For A Cottage Food Operation To Be Exempt From Food Establishment Permit Fees; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cottage foods; further define and increase seller's allowed annual gross sales amount to $50,000.00.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-14 - Senate - Senate Failed (Y: 11 N: 36 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-15SenateDied On Calendar
2024-03-14SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2024-03-14SenateFailed
2024-03-14SenateAmended
2024-03-14SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2024-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2024-02-19SenateReferred To Agriculture

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7529951Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback