MS SB2636 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Avails Of The Sales Tax That Are Derived From Sales By Cotton Compresses Or Cotton Warehouses And That Would Otherwise Be Paid Into The General Fund, Shall Be Deposited Into The Boll Weevil Management Fund Until Such Time That The Total Amount Deposited Into The Fund During A Fiscal Year Equals $1,000,000.00; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales tax; divert a portion derived from sales by cotton warehouses or compresses to the Boll Weevil Management Fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] | Sen. Perry Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-23 | Concurred in Amend From House | |
2010-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-11 | Referred To Ways and Means | |
2010-02-10 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-09 | Passed | |
2010-02-09 | Motion to Recommit Lost | |
2010-01-21 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-14 | Referred To Finance |