MS SB2632 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-01 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 73-5-3, 73-5-7, 73-5-8, 73-5-9, 73-5-23, 73-5-25, 73-5-27, 73-5-29, 73-5-33, 73-5-39 And 73-5-43, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Relating To The Barber Practice Act, To Provide For An Executive Director Of The Board Of Barber Examiners; To Provide For Inspectors; To Provide Qualifications For Registration As A Barber Instructor; To Provide Qualifications For Registration As A Barber; To Provide Requirements For Display Of Barber Licenses; To Provide Grounds For License Disciplinary Action; To Provide Hearing Procedures Before The Board; To Prescribe Fees; To Revise The Definition Of The Practice Of Barbering; To Prescribe Criminal Penalties For Violations Of The Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Barber Practice Act; make technical revisions to.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-24 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 95 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 95 N: 23 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-01 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-24 | Concurred in Amend From House | |
2010-03-05 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-04 | Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services | |
2010-02-15 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-11 | Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-27 | DR - TSDP: PH To JB | |
2010-01-14 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Judiciary, Division B |