MS SB2631 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-9-351, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of The Term "telemedicine" As Used In The Statute Requiring Health Insurance Plans To Provide Coverage For Telemedicine Services; To Require Health Insurance And Employee Benefit Plans To Reimburse Providers For Telemedicine Services Using The Proper Medical Codes; To Provide That Reimbursement Of Expenses For Covered Health Care Services Provided During A Telemedicine Encounter Must Be Established Through Negotiations In The Same Manner As The Health Insurance Entity Establishes Reimbursement Of Expenses For Covered Health Care Services Delivered By In-person Means; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Health insurance; revise mandated coverage for telemedicine services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Zuber,Ford (54th),Guice |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Conferees Named Michel,Boyd,Kirby |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |