MS SB2628 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact Section 75-67-403, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Defines Certain Terms Used Under The Mississippi Title Pledge Act; To Reenact Section 75-67-505, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Establishes Licensing Requirements For Check Cashers Under The Mississippi Check Cashers Act; To Reenact Sections 75-67-601 Through 75-67-639, Mississippi Code Of 971, Which Create The Mississippi Credit Availability Act; To Amend Reenacted Section 75-67-639, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Repealer On The Previously Mentioned Sections In The Mississippi Title Pledge Act And The Mississippi Check Cashers Act, And To Extend The Repealer On The Mississippi Credit Availability Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Credit Availability Act; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Passed |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
75 | 67 | 403 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 505 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 601 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 603 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 605 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 607 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 609 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 611 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 613 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 615 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 617 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 619 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 621 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 623 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 625 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 627 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 629 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 631 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 633 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 635 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 637 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
75 | 67 | 639 | New Code | See Bill Text |