MS SB2616 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 73-35-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Reduce The Licensing Fees Charged By The Real Estate Commission; To Direct The State Fiscal Officer To Transfer A Certain Sum From The Real Estate License Fund To The Real Estate Appraiser License Fund During Fiscal Year 2024; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Real Estate Commission; decrease fees charged by.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-04-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2023-03-17 | House | Conferees Named Read,Oliver,Ladner |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Michel,DeBar |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-03 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-02 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-02 | House | Amended |
2023-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Passed |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |