MS SB2616 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Mississippi Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Transfer And Convey Certain Real Property To The Mississippi Department Of Transportation Located In Harrison County, Mississippi; To Authorize The Mississippi Forestry Commission To Lease Certain State-owned Property Located In Union County, Mississippi; To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration, Acting On Behalf Of The Pearl River Valley Water Supply District, To Donate And Convey To The City Of Flowood And County Of Rankin, Mississippi, Required Interests In State-owned Property Necessary For The Expansion Of Old Fannin Road; To Rename The Ross Barnett Lake In Mize, Mississippi, The Prentiss Walker Lake; To Authorize The Mississippi Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Donate And Convey Lake Dockery To The City Of Byram In Hinds County, Mississippi; To Provide That The Alcorn State University Baseball Park On The Campus Of Alcorn State University In Lorman, Mississippi, Shall Be Named The Willie E. "rat" Mcgowan, Sr., Baseball Stadium; To Provide That The Baseball Field Within The Willie E. "rat" Mcgowan Stadium Shall Be Named The William "bill" Foster Baseball Field; To Authorize The Department Of Archives And History To Proceed With The Recovery And Restoration Of An Historic Shipwreck; To Authorize The Use Of Private Funds; To Create A Special Fund For Such Purpose; To Direct Certain State Agencies To Aid The Department Of Archives And History In The Recovery And Restoration Process; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public property; authorize transfer of various state-owned properties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 109 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Eaton,Parker,Coleman (65th) | |
2010-03-16 | Conferees Named Gollott,Hudson,Dearing | |
2010-03-16 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-11 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Reconsidered | |
2010-03-04 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-04 | Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-16 | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-10 | Passed | |
2010-02-10 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2010-02-01 | DR - TSDPCS: WI To PP | |
2010-01-14 | Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks;Public Property |