MS SB2610 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 23-15-615, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Secretary Of State To Audit Election Procedures In The Counties Of This State; To Require The Registrar Of Each County To Submit Certain Totals To The Secretary Of State Within A Period Of Days After An Election; To Authorize The Secretary Of State To Conduct An Audit If A Discrepancy In The Submitted Totals Meets Or Exceeds Enumerated Thresholds; To Require Random Audits; To Provide Certain Procedures For The Audit; To Create New Section 23-15-617, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Risk-limiting Audit For Elections That Occur After August 31, 2026; To Require The Election Commissioners In Conjunction With The Registrars To Conduct An Audit Upon The Selection Of The Secretary Of State; To Authorize The Secretary Of State To Set Certain Risk-limiting Thresholds; To Require A Manual Recount Of An Election In The Event Of A Difference Between The Tabulation From The Manual Recount And The Tabulation Reported From A Voting System; To Provide Procedures For The Risk-limiting Audit; To Define The Term "auditable Voting System"; To Provide Which Record Is The Official Record Of The Vote Cast In The Event Of A Risk-limiting Audit; To Authorize A Pilot Program For At Least Five Counties Beginning With The Election Taking Place On November 8, 2022; To Amend Sections 23-15-153 And 23-15-603, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Repeal Section 23-15-613, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Is The Provision That Requires Certain Election Officials To Report Residual Votes To The Secretary Of State; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Election procedures; authorize audits.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Tate [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Elections;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 15 | 153 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 613 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2022/pdf/history/SB/SB2610.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2022/html/SB/2600-2699/SB2610IN.htm |