MS SB2609 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize And Direct The State Department Of Education To Provide Clerical, Administrative, Human Resources Payroll And Purchasing Support For The Mississippi School Of The Arts (msa), The Mississippi School Of The Blind And The Mississippi School For The Deaf (msb/msd); To Authorize The State Department Of Education To Promulgate Policies For The Utilization Of The Central Business Services; To Provide That Administrative, And Instructional Employees At The Msa And Msb/msd Shall Be Contract Employees And To Provide For The Execution Of Said Contracts; To Provide That Noninstructional Employees At Said Schools Shall Serve At The Will And Pleasure Of The Respective Superintendent(s); To Amend Sections 25-9-107, 31-7-1, 37-7-307, 37-9-17, 37-9-33, 37-9-59, 37-9-103 And 43-5-8, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Exempt Administrative And Instructional Employees At The Msa And Msb/msd From State Service Provisions And To Include Such Certificated Employees In Provisions Applicable To Certified Teachers; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Department of Education to provide central business services for MSA and MSB/MSD; authorize.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2018-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Bennett,DeLano,Roberson |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Polk,Hill |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-03-05 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-01 | House | Amended |
2018-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To ED |
2018-02-22 | House | DR - TSDPAA: ED To AP |
2018-02-14 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-30 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: AP To ED |
2018-01-24 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: ED To AP |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Education;Appropriations |